Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Nicola Condulmer

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1683Born
18 Dec 171835.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Dec 171835.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 172339.6AppointedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
23 May 172339.7Ordained BishopBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
27 Feb 173652.4AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
14 Mar 174763.5DiedBishop of Belluno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Nicola Condulmer
Bishop Domenico Nicola Condulmer (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenise

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 313
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018