Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cinugo Settimio Cinughi

Deceased

Bishop of Pienza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1670³BornSiena
22 Sep 169726.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 172554.5AppointedBishop of Pienza, Italy
27 May 172554.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pienza, Italy
Mar 1740³69.3DiedBishop of Pienza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cinugo Settimio Cinughi:
Bishop Cinugo Settimio Cinughi (born , died Mar 1740) Bishop of Pienza

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1740
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 314
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015