Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacopo Maria Erizzo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1678BornVenice
19 Apr 170526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
26 Jun 172445.7AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
2 Jul 172445.7Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
26 Nov 176082.1DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for Jacopo Maria Erizzo:
Bishop Jacopo Maria Erizzo O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013