Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Serafino Cardinal Cenci

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1676Born
28 Dec 172650.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Jan 172750.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 173357.5AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
26 Dec 173357.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
24 Mar 173457.8Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jun 173559.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
24 Jun 174064.0DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Serafino Cenci
Serafino Cardinal Cenci (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 13.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
  • a cardinal for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Mar 1734
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,733, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast