Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flaminius Danza

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1691Born
16 Mar 171524.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 173544.9AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
21 Dec 173544.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
11 Feb 176271.0DiedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Flaminius Danza
Bishop Flaminius Danza (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadula

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018