Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustachius Entreri, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1689³BornSan Petri in Guarano
28 Feb 171122.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Minims
20 Feb 171223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
21 Jul 173243.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
21 Jul 173243.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Samaria
25 Jul 173243.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samaria
3 Mar 173849.1AppointedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
11 Mar 174556.1DiedBishop of Nicotera, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eustachius Entreri:
Bishop Eustachius Entreri O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Nicotera

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 311, and Page 365
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015