Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Beni

Deceased

Bishop of Fano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1677Born
14 May 171942.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 173356.4AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
22 Nov 173356.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
16 Jun 176487.2DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Beni
Bishop Giacomo Beni (born , died ) Bishop of Fano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGubbio, Diocese of Gubbio

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,733, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast