Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Antonio Sacchi

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1675BornFluminis Frigidi
3 May 170025.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 May 170025.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 172448.8AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
20 Feb 172448.8Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
Jul 1738³63.2DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Antonio Sacchi:
Bishop Giulio Antonio Sacchi (born , died Jul 1738) Bishop of Monopoli

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015