Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Caietanus de’ Cavalieri

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Tarsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1677Born
21 Mar 172244.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Mar 172244.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
7 Apr 172244.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
4 May 172244.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
29 Mar 173254.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
Jul 1732³54.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
10 Oct 173860.7DiedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Caietanus de’ Cavalieri
Archbishop Caietanus de’ Cavalieri (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Portugal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Italy

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 370
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 15
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 238

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018