Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Vantini

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1676³Born
21 Dec 171539.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 172750.9AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
23 Mar 172751.0Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
19 Jan 174669.8DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Vantini
Bishop Antonio Maria Vantini (born , died ) Bishop of Montepulciano

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto Ferrajo

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1734
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018