Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Miroballo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Nazareth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1682Born
19 Sep 170523.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 171735.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
26 Dec 171735.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
22 Mar 172643.6ResignedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Miroballo
Archbishop Salvatore Miroballo (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Nazareth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Ignace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,531

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast