Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Silvio Cardinal Passionei

Deceased

Librarian of the Vatican Library

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archives


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1682BornFossombrone, Italy
13 Jul 172138.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Jul 172138.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
25 Jul 172138.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
30 Jul 172138.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
23 Dec 173048.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
173855.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
23 Jun 173855.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Jul 173855.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
22 Jan 175572.1AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
22 Jan 175572.1AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
17 Feb 175572.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
12 Feb 175976.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
5 Jul 176178.6DiedLibrarian of the Vatican Library

MicroData Summary for Domenico Silvio Passionei:
Cardinal Domenico Silvio Passionei (born , died ) Librarian of Vatican Library

  • a bishop for 39.9 years
  • a cardinal for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1738
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Jun 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013