Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccol˛ di Domenico

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1664³BornNapoli
11 Apr 168824.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 171853.8AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
13 Feb 171853.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
22 Aug 174480.3DiedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ di Domenico:
Bishop Niccol˛ di Domenico (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1736
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1718, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015