Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Bataller, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1659BornPerpinan, Spain
28 Aug 172565.9SelectedBishop of Ugento, Italy
19 Dec 172566.2ConfirmedBishop of Ugento, Italy
13 Jan 172666.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
1 Dec 173576.2DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Bataller:
Bishop Francesco Bataller O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Ugento

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013