Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pablo Vilana Perlas

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1669³Born
25 Jan 169424.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 171546.8AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
22 Dec 171546.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
6 Feb 172354.0SelectedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
12 May 172354.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
6 May 172960.2DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pablo Vilana Perlas
Archbishop Pablo Vilana Perlas (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona, Spain

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 129, and Page 340
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 33, Number 100
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,715, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast