Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marino Carmignano

Deceased

Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1663³Born
22 Sep 169633.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Dec 169633.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 170340.8AppointedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
Dec 1729³66.8DiedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marino Carmignano
Bishop Marino Carmignano (born , died Dec 1729) Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 32.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,723
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 152
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,703, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast