Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Guicciardi

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1662BornPonte in Valtellina
5 Apr 169229.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 May 169229.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 170946.3AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
21 May 170946.4Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
24 Jan 171855.1AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
18 Jan 172562.1DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Guicciardi:
Bishop Francesco Saverio Guicciardi (born , died ) Bishop of Cesena

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 134, and Page 280
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015