Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Positano

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi Risorta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1677BornNapoli
17 Dec 170124.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 172043.0AppointedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
22 Dec 172043.0Ordained BishopBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
Dec 1732³55.0DiedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Positano:
Bishop Filippo Positano (born , died Dec 1732) Bishop of Calvi Risorta

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 138
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015