Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Maria Lomellino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ajaccio, France

Titular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1689³Born
4 Oct 171121.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 172333.2AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
31 Jan 172333.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
26 Nov 174152.0ResignedBishop of Ajaccio, France
18 Apr 174252.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maria Lomellino
Archbishop Carlo Maria Lomellino (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovi

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,733
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 68
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,744
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,723, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast