Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Zondadari

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1669³Born
5 Jun 169424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Siena, Italy
21 Jan 171545.0AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
31 Mar 171545.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siena, Italy
11 Aug 171545.6InstalledArchbishop of Siena, Italy
2 Jan 174575.0DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Zondadari (VIAF: 287245131)
Archbishop Alessandro Zondadari (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Archdiocese of Siena
Ordained BishopSanti Domenico e Sisto, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceSiena, Archdiocese of Siena
Buried Place (Current)San Giorgio, Church, Siena, Archdiocese of Siena

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 353
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,715, Number 24
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,567
  • c2: AT, 4 May 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,715

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast