Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Colombino Bassi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1660³BornGenova
26 Mar 168929.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
6 May 171555.1AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
12 May 171555.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
11 Apr 173272.0DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Colombino Bassi:
Bishop Colombino Bassi O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 10 Jul 2015