Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flaminio Dondi, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montefeltro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1662Born
1 May 168522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
11 Apr 171754.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abdera
12 Apr 1717³54.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
12 Apr 1717³54.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
20 Nov 172462.4AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
12 Aug 172967.2DiedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Flaminio Dondi
Bishop Flaminio Dondi O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Montefeltro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParma

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 65, and Page 200
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast