Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Savastani, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1660³BornNapoli
21 Sep 168524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Sep 172261.9AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
27 Sep 172261.9Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
Aug 1727³66.7DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Savastani:
Bishop Pietro Savastani O.F.M. (born , died Aug 1727) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 149
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015