Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Costa de Puerto, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1681³Born
19 Mar 170726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Nov 172342.7AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
30 Nov 172342.7Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
26 Jan 175371.9DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Costa de Puerto
Bishop Gaetano Costa de Puerto O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortugallen

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 174
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018