Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniele Scoppa, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1619³BornNapoli
16 May 169576.2AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
23 May 169576.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nola, Italy
13 May 170384.2DiedBishop of Nola, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniele Scoppa:
Bishop Daniele Scoppa O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Nola

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015