Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Perissi

Deceased

Bishop of Grosseto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1631¹BornSienne
9 Jan 169261.0AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
20 Jan 169261.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
28 May 170069.4AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
Nov 1701³70.8DiedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Perissi:
Bishop Sebastiano Perissi (born 1631, died Nov 1701) Bishop of Grosseto

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 213, and Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015