Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo della Marra, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alessano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645BornNapoli
16 May 169550.4AppointedBishop of Alessano, Italy
23 May 169550.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alessano, Italy
27 Apr 171267.3DiedBishop of Alessano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo della Marra:
Bishop Vincenzo della Marra C.R.L. (died ) Bishop of Alessano

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013