Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teofilo Testa, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tropea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1631³Born
18 Dec 165524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
25 Jun 169260.7AppointedBishop of Tropea, Italy
30 Jun 169260.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tropea, Italy
21 Oct 169564.1DiedBishop of Tropea, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teofilo Testa
Bishop Teofilo Testa O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Tropea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Pauli

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 392
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast