Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Genesio Calchi

Deceased

Bishop of Lucca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1667Born
21 Jun 169325.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Jun 169325.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 171446.6AppointedBishop of Lucca, Italy
10 Jun 171446.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lucca, Italy
20 Jan 172355.2DiedBishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Genesio Calchi
Bishop Genesio Calchi (born , died ) Bishop of Lucca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 247
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018