Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benjamin Petre, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Prusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1672Born
14 May 169724.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 172148.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
23 Jun 172148.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Prusa
11 Nov 172149.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Prusa
12 Mar 173461.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
22 Dec 175886.3DiedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Benjamin Petre (VIAF: 239570000)
Bishop Benjamin Petre O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of London District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFidlers, Writtle, Chelmsford, Essex, Vicariate Apostolic of England (and Wales)
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopHammersmith, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Death PlaceGolden Square, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Original)Old St. Pancras Churchyard, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Current)St. Edmund's, College, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 324
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 168
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 42
  • loc/op: CL, 20 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast