Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Bradley (Brullaughan (Ó Brolcháin)), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1704²Born
6 Jan 175147.0SelectedBishop of Derry, Ireland
29 Jan 175147.0ConfirmedBishop of Derry, Ireland
14 Mar 175147.2Ordained BishopBishop of Derry, Ireland
20 Dec 175147.9ResignedBishop of Derry, Ireland
May 1760³56.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Derry, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Bradley (Brullaughan (Ó Brolcháin))
Bishop Patrick Bradley (Brullaughan (Ó Brolcháin)) O.P. (born 1704, died May 1760) Bishop Emeritus of Derry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeagh Temporal, Granaghan
Ordained BishopSardinian Embassy, Chapel, London

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 194
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 9
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast