Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Robert Talbot

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Birtha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1726Born
19 Dec 175024.4Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
10 Mar 175932.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
10 Mar 175932.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Birtha
24 Aug 175933.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Birtha
12 Jan 178154.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
24 Jan 179063.5DiedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Robert Talbot
Bishop James Robert Talbot (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of London District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShrewsbury House, Isleworth, Middlesex, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestCambrai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopHammersmith, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Death PlaceHammersmith, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Paul's, Church, Hammersmith, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Current)St. Edmund's, College, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bp/bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 191
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 122, and Page 454
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast