Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Gibson

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Comana Armeniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1734Born
1758¹23.7Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
17 Jun 178046.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
17 Jun 178046.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
3 Sep 178046.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
17 May 179056.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthew Gibson (VIAF: 14627823)
Bishop Matthew Gibson (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStonecroft, Hexham, Northumberland, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopLondon, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Death PlaceStella Hall, Blaydon, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter, Church, Newbrough, Hexham, Northumberland, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 175, and Page 454
  • ob/c23/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,281
  • bp/bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 95
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 29
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • loc: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast