Catholic-Hierarchy DC

William Cardinal Allen

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532BornRossal Grange, Lancashire, England, Great Britain
156533.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 158755.5Elevated to Cardinal
31 Aug 158755.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
16 Oct 159462.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

MicroData Summary for William Allen:
William Cardinal Allen (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a cardinal for 7.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Aug 1587

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015