Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Bishop

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of England (and Wales), Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Chalcedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1553¹Born
May 1583³30.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 162370.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of England (and Wales), Great Britain
15 Mar 162370.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Chalcedon
4 Jun 162370.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chalcedon
13 Apr 162471.2DiedVicar Apostolic of England (and Wales), Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Bishop (VIAF: 15119037)
Bishop William Bishop (born 1553, died ) Vicar Apostolic of England (and Wales)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrailes, Warwickshire
Ordained PriestLaon (Aisne), Diocese of Soissons, France
Ordained BishopParis, Diocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceBishopscourt, Southwark, London, Vicariate Apostolic of England (and Wales)
Buried Place (Original)St. Saviour's, Church, Southwark, London, Vicariate Apostolic of England (and Wales)

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for .8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 147
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 37
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 23
  • op: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 21 Jan 2018