Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Butt

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Nicopsis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1869Born
18 Jul 189728.3Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
16 Jan 191141.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
16 Jan 191141.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis
24 Feb 191141.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis
23 Apr 193869.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
23 Apr 193869.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicopsis
23 Aug 194475.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Butt
Archbishop Joseph Butt (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRichmond-on-Thames, Surrey, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestSt. John, Seminary, Wonersh, Guildford, Surry, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceSt. Gregory, Abbey, Downside, Radstock, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Gregory, Abbey, Downside, Radstock, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 18
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 56
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast