Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel John Bidwell

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Miletopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1872Born
8 May 189825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
30 Oct 191745.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
30 Oct 191745.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
8 Dec 191745.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
11 Jul 193058.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel John Bidwell
Bishop Emmanuel John Bidwell (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalma de Mallorca, Islas Baleares, Diocese of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain
Ordained PriestAcademy of Noble Ecclesiastics, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceSt. Mary, Church, Chelsea, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Vincent, Hospital, Eastcote, Pinner, Middlesex, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 54
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 252
  • op: Arundel to Zabi, Page 34
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast