Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father James Ireland, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1895Born
15 Jul 192328.2Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
28 Mar 195256.9AppointedPrefect of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)
7 May 197378.0RetiredPrefect of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)
12 Sep 198691.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)

MicroData Summary for James Ireland
Father James Ireland M.H.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Falkland Islands o Malvinas

EventPlace
Birth PlacePreston, Diocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph's, College, Mill Hill, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain
Death PlaceHerbert House, Formby, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
Buried Place (Original)Herbert House, Formby, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 63.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 26 Jun 2015
  • c1/loc: CL, 13 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast