Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Boerkamp, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Jammu and Kashmir, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1906Born
12 Jul 193629.8Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
10 Jul 196356.8AppointedPrefect of Kashmir and Jammu, India
1978²71.3ResignedPrefect of Jammu and Kashmir, India
5 Feb 198477.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Jammu and Kashmir, India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Boerkamp
Father John Boerkamp M.H.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Jammu and Kashmir

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDuistervoorde, Twello, Archdiocese of Utrecht, Netherlands
Death PlaceSint Jozef Ziekenhuizen

  • a priest for 47.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1971

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018