Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilberto de Hastings

Deceased

Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1100¹Born
1147²47.0AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
1 Nov 114747.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
2 Mar 1164¹64.1DiedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilberto de Hastings
Bishop Gilberto de Hastings (born 1100, died ) Bishop of Lisboa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHastings, Great Britain
Ordained BishopLisboa, Diocese of Lisboa

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB, 21 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 27 Feb 2019

Quantcast