Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Hugh David Renwick Turnbull Allan, O. Praem.

Apostolic Administrator of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)

Priest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines

Superior of Saint Helena, Ascension and Tristan da Cunha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1976 Born
1996¹19.4Converted
27 Oct 200125.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
22 Nov 200226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
29 Sep 201640.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)
29 Sep 201640.1AppointedSuperior of Saint Helena, Ascension and Tristan da Cunha
8 Dec 201640.3InstalledApostolic Administrator of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugh David Renwick Turnbull Allan
Abbot Hugh David Renwick Turnbull Allan O. Praem. (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Falkland Islands o Malvinas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHatfield, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestCorpus Christi, Church, Miles Platting, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England, Great Britain

Please contact the Abbot through the Prefecture Apostolic of Falkland Islands o Malvinas.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • mn: CB, 27 Oct 2016
  • ab: CB, 21 Jan 2018
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • op.loc: CL, 5 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast