Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Guazzelli

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Lindisfarna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1920Born
17 Mar 194524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
24 Apr 197050.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
24 Apr 197050.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lindisfarna
23 May 197050.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lindisfarna
21 Dec 199676.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
1 Jun 200484.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Victor Guazzelli (VIAF: 111083543)
Bishop Victor Guazzelli (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStepney, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained PriestSts. Peter and Paul, Seminary, Lisbon, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceSt. Peter, Little Sisters of the Poor, Convent, Vauxhall, London, Archdiocese of Southwark, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Cemetery, Kensal Green, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 23 Apr 2018