Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Malcolm Brignall

Bishop of Wrexham, Wales


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1953 BornWhetstone, London
Jun 1977³23.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
18 Feb 197824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
12 Feb 198733.6IncardinatedPriest of Wrexham, Wales, Great Britain
27 Jun 201259.0AppointedBishop of Wrexham, Wales, Great Britain
12 Sep 201259.2Ordained BishopBishop of Wrexham, Wales, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Malcolm Brignall:
Bishop Peter Malcolm Brignall (born ) Bishop of Wrexham

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wrexham.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2012
  • ob: CB, 27 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,540

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013