Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Patrick Crowley

Bishop Emeritus of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1941 Born
12 Jun 196523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
31 Oct 198645.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
31 Oct 198645.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thala
8 Dec 198645.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thala
3 Nov 199251.3AppointedBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
3 May 200765.8ResignedBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Patrick Crowley
Bishop John Patrick Crowley (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Middlesbrough

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewbury, Berkshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Ordained PriestMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Middlesbrough.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 May 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018