Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip James Benedict Harvey

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Bahanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1915Born
3 Jun 193924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
28 Mar 197762.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
28 Mar 197762.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bahanna
25 Apr 197762.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bahanna
3 Jul 199075.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
2 Feb 200387.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Philip James Benedict Harvey
Bishop Philip James Benedict Harvey (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRichmond-on-Thames, Surrey, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceNazareth House, Finchley, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Cemetery, Kensal Green, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast