Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Cahill

Deceased

Bishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1841Born
16 Oct 186423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
31 Mar 190058.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
31 Mar 190058.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagora
1 May 190058.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagora
30 Aug 190058.9AppointedBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
2 Aug 191068.9DiedBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Cahill (VIAF: 307167028)
Bishop John Baptist Cahill (born , died ) Bishop of Portsmouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Middlesex, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Edmund, College, Old Hall Green, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Portsmouth, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Death PlaceBishop's House, Edinburgh Road, Portsmouth, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Church, Ryde, Isle of Wight, Diocese of Portsmouth, England

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 467, and Page 544
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 57
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast