Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Maurice Graham

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Plymouth, England

Titular Bishop of Tiberias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1834BornMhow, East Indies
19 Dec 185723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
25 Sep 189157.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
25 Sep 189157.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cisamus
28 Oct 189157.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cisamus
25 Oct 190268.6SucceededBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
16 Mar 191176.9RetiredBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
16 Mar 191176.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
2 Sep 191278.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Plymouth, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Charles Maurice Graham:
Bishop Charles Maurice Graham (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Plymouth

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 206, and Page 460
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 11 Nov 2014