Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Robert Bernard Brownlow

Deceased

Bishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1830Born
Nov 1863³33.3Converted
22 Dec 186636.4Ordained PriestPriest of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
20 Mar 189463.7AppointedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
1 May 189463.8Ordained BishopBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
9 Nov 190171.3DiedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Robert Bernard Brownlow (VIAF: 63152424)
Bishop William Robert Bernard Brownlow (born , died ) Bishop of Clifton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWilmslow, Cheshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopTwelve Apostles, Pro-Cathedral, Clifton, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England
Death PlaceBishop's House, 22 Meridian Place, Clifton, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England
Buried Place (Original)Chapel Crypt, Holy Souls, Cemetery, Arnos Vale, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 210
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 49
  • mn/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 9
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast