Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Bellord

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gibraltar

Titular Bishop of Milevum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1846Born
16 Feb 189952.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gibraltar
16 Feb 189952.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
1 May 189953.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum
29 Jul 190155.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Gibraltar
11 Jun 190559.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gibraltar

MicroData Summary for James Bellord (VIAF: 2277147665811860670008)
Bishop James Bellord (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gibraltar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopS. Dominic, Priory, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,899, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast