Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Andrew Giffard

Deceased

Priest

Priest of London District, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646²Born
Jan 1674³28.0Ordained PriestPriest of England (and Wales), Great Britain
21 Aug 170559.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
21 Aug 170559.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuria
28 Sep 171468.7DiedPriest

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Andrew Giffard
Father Andrew Giffard (born 1646, died ) Priest

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWolverhampton, Staffordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of England (and Wales), Great Britain

  • a priest for 40.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 154
  • op/d: CB, 20 Feb 2016
  • bp: CL, 22 Jan 2018
  • opd: CB, 11 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 12 Jan 2021

Quantcast